Financial history INTERNATIONAL CENTRE FOR PRAYER

Charity number: 1143862
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £23.08k £21.62k £24.97k £24.96k £24.85k
Total expenditure £23.00k £19.95k £24.31k £24.90k £24.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A