PORTSMOUTH JAMI MOSQUE & ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Mosque is open all day for daily and Friday prayers. During the week we have over 100 people who regularly attend daily prayers and over 500 who regularly attend Friday prayers. The mosque/ Centre is also used for festivals, funeral facilities, civil marriage and nikkah, hafiz classes, Islamic awareness, inter-faith dialogue, zakat, library, etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 15 February 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Redwan Ahmed | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abidur Rahman Choudhury | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jubaer Miah | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fhakruz Zaman Khan | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.27k | £89.53k | £107.63k | £122.93k | £175.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.03k | £91.36k | £95.63k | £118.57k | £133.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 24 January 2024 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 24 January 2024 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/03/1995 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01/01/2012
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN PORTSMOUTH AND SURROUNDING AREAS, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, RELIGIOUS SERVICES, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE TO HELP ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE RELIGION OF ISLAM. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL CLASSES. 3) THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTAUL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS. 4) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF PORTSMOUTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Portsmouth Jami Mosque
Victoria Road North
Southsea
PO5 1PS
- Phone:
- 023 9283 2541
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window