ROYALTEMPLE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian Worship Children's Sunday School Christian Studies Training & Adult Courses Family Support Units Homeless Support Community Development Projects Christian Counselling Royalenterprise Sports and Leisure
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Angola
- Belgium
- Ghana
- Kenya
- Netherlands
- United States
Governance
- 13 September 2011: Standard registration
- 04 October 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ROYALENTERPRISE (Working name)
- ROYALKIDS (Working name)
- ROYALKIDS CLUB (Working name)
- ROYALMEN (Working name)
- ROYALWOMEN (Working name)
- ROYALYOUTH (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 February 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 February 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 February 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 February 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 February 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 February 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 February 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 February 2016 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/02/2011 AS AMENDED ON 12/09/2011
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS. 2. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE 3. THE FURTHERANCE AND PURSUANCE OF THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW, AS THE DIRECTORS/TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY MAY AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window