CROUCH END CHAVURAH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Crouch End Chavurah is a progressive Jewish community organisation based in the Crouch End Area of North London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Barnet
- Camden
- Haringey
- Islington
Governance
- 06 October 2011: Standard registration
- CEC (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Miriam Levin | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE ANTHONY LEVONTINE | Trustee | 06 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANNA MIRIAM WISE | Trustee | 06 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.30k | £68.45k | £62.70k | £69.29k | £70.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.62k | £55.03k | £59.44k | £74.19k | £78.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 09 July 2024 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 09 July 2024 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 July 2021 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 July 2021 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 18 August 2020 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 18 August 2020 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/08/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CROUCH END CHAVURAH ARE TO ADVANCE THE JEWISH RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF LIBERAL JUDAISM WITHIN CROUCH END, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ARRANGING AND CONDUCTING LIBERAL JEWISH RELIGIOUS SERVICES, LIFECYCLE EVENTS AND EVENTS RELATING TO THE TRADITIONAL JEWISH FESTIVALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2a Fairfield Road
London
N8 9HG
- Phone:
- 07939113762
- Email:
- chair@crouchendchavurah.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window