CHRIST APOSTOLIC CHURCH LIVINGWORD CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CAC Livingword benefit the pubilc by currently providing the following services which are available to everyone in the community: Drop-in biblical counselling, Prayer support, Youth adults meetings, Sunday Services, Sunday School, Mid week bible study, Monthly all night prayer,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
- Nigeria
Governance
- 13 October 2011: Standard registration
- CAC LIVINGWORD (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OLUSOLA DOJA LUFADEJU | Chair | 13 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
John Lufadeju | Trustee | 12 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOSHUA OLUTOYE | Trustee | 13 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Evang E O ADEBISI | Trustee | 13 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.50k | £32.91k | £28.14k | £23.22k | £25.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.03k | £42.82k | £31.87k | £32.04k | £32.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 13 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 14 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 09/10/2011
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE CHRISTIAN FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. 2) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED. 3) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 STAFFA ROAD
LEYTON
LONDON
E10 7PY
- Phone:
- 07961611208
- Email:
- HELLO@LIVINGWORD.CC
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window