Financial history MALTON DODGER LIMITED

Charity Number: 1146990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £33.42k £45.05k £45.05k £69.48k £47.01k
Total expenditure £26.87k £31.12k £31.12k £40.94k £45.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.09k N/A N/A N/A N/A