LYTHAM ST CUTHBERTS PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL

Charity number: 1143673
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PROVISION OF REGULAR PUBLIC WORSHIP & SACRED SPACE FOR PERSONAL PRAYER, & CONTEMPLATION; PASTORAL CARE - VISITING SICK & BEREAVED PROMOTING & TEACHING CHRISTIANITY THROUGH SERMONS & SMALL GROUPS PROMOTING THE MISSION OF THE CHURCH IN ENGLAND, PROVISION OF COMMUNITY ACTIVITIES FOR ALL AGES MAINTAIN & MANAGE A CHURCH HALL FOR COMMUNITY USE MAINTAIN & MANAGE A CHURCHYARD

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 September 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Revd Nick Wells Chair 03 March 2016
None on record
Linda Carol Hyland Trustee 18 April 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE DIVINE AND ST CUTHBERT LYTHAM
Received: On time
Julie Smith Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
MRS Debbie Edwards Trustee 08 June 2015
None on record
Elizabeth Willis Trustee 21 April 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £130.93k £112.92k £128.60k £67.33k £0
Total expenditure £183.84k £175.03k £164.10k £88.15k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
c/o St. Cuthberts Parish Office
Church Road
Lytham
Lancashire
FY8 5QL
Phone:
01253736488