WE ARE SURVIVORS

Charity Number: 1144941
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote & protect the good health of male survivors of sexual abuse, rape & sexual exploitation; alongside those affected by male sexual violation; across Greater Manchester and throughout England & Wales by providing qualified Counsellors, Psychotherapists, Social Workers, ISVAs and Support Workers to advise and support them to cope and recover to move beyond their unwanted sexual experiences

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 December 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • SURVIVORS MANCHESTER (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Prof Craig Harris Chair 29 November 2009
None on record
Kevin Mark Vanterpool Trustee 22 October 2023
None on record
Scott Webster Trustee 18 October 2023
None on record
Dr Andrew Tomkins Trustee 25 October 2020
None on record
Christos Tsaprounis Trustee 14 December 2018
None on record
MRS FRANCES HEALEY Trustee 19 January 2013
ROOLEY MOOR NEIGHBOURHOOD FORUM
Received: On time
TODMORDEN ORCHESTRA
Received: On time
QUARANTINE
Received: On time
EVAN MARK CHISWELL Trustee 06 December 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £640.74k £904.06k £1.02m £1.67m £1.73m
Total expenditure £603.72k £727.13k £985.92k £1.36m £1.74m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £870.90k
Income from government grants £271.86k £463.97k £522.27k £510.96k £698.94k
Income - Donations and legacies £17.22k £151.05k £16.70k £20.66k £22.92k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £544.29k £752.55k £475.91k £1.63m £1.69m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £10.50k £20.86k
Income - Other £68.56k £456 £2.93k £8.67k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £586.88k £703.34k £949.85k £1.30m £1.72m
Expenditure - Raising funds £16.85k £23.78k £36.07k £57.74k £23.51k
Expenditure - Governance £10.74k £0 £40.77k £39.17k £37.39k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £27.25k £31.79k £25.02k £17.51k £6.47k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £351.67k £1.56m £1.29m £1.31m £1.34m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £121.49k £1.16m £853.37k £552.98k £578.41k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 17 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 17 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 20 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 08 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
We Are Survivors
Unit 9 Brewery Yard
Deva City Office Park
Trinity Way
SALFORD
M3 7BB
Phone:
01612362182