Financial history THE KIER FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1144803
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £175.39k £284.13k £155.37k £291.82k £265.31k
Total expenditure £229.71k £301.90k £134.86k £270.89k £187.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A