CAMBRIDGE SIKH SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sikh place of worship and related community activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 24 November 2011: Standard registration
- 28 November 2011: Funds received from 285789 CAMBRIDGE SIKH SOCIETY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Padamjeet Singh Aulakh | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ishmeet Singh Arora | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Surinder Singh Saini | Trustee | 21 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kanwalpreet Singh Chanana | Trustee | 12 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
HARJIT Singh | Trustee | 19 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jagjit Srai | Trustee | 19 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.59k | £23.37k | £27.62k | £44.28k | £49.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.14k | £18.96k | £23.83k | £25.07k | £32.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £25.38k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 22 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 10 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 24 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 24 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/08/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/11/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/11/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE SIKH RELIGION IN CAMBRIDGESHIRE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE SHRI GURU GRANTH SAHIB JI (THE SIKH HOLY BOOK) BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A PERMANENT GURDWARA (SIKH TEMPLE).
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. INPRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
150
ARBURY ROAD
ARBURY COURT
CAMBRIDGE
CB4 2JQ
- Phone:
- 07734 605445
- Email:
- cambridgegurdwara@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window