Financial history SUFFOLK WEST CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity Number: 1144118
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £570.96k £617.57k £685.89k £602.28k £759.72k
Total expenditure £636.70k £620.17k £627.65k £604.85k £680.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £383.28k £364.49k £330.39k £322.10k £320.61k
Income - Donations and legacies £6.02k £794 £3.27k £6.90k £8.23k
Income - Other trading activities £7.64k £3.08k £7.51k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £143.95k £238.46k £656.48k £577.23k £724.04k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.03k £1.33k £1.54k £3.39k £14.94k
Income - Other £26.03k £9.41k £17.09k £14.76k £12.52k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £634.77k £619.34k £627.11k £604.85k £680.56k
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.94k £823 £540 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £10.03k £10.42k £6.77k £7.60k £7.43k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0