SHAIK ABDUL GAFFAR MAMOR KHANI TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO RUN SUPPLEMENTARY EDUCATION CLASSES FOR 7YRS - 16 YRS AGE GROUP CHILDREN TO RUN ELDERLY AND PENSIONERS CLUB THREE DAYS A WEEK TO RUN IAG (Advice, information and Guidance for) for unemployed men and women in the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 05 December 2011: Standard registration
- TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MD ABDUL KARIM | Chair | 05 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Md Abdur Razzak | Trustee | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMED ABDUL KAHIR | Trustee | 31 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.85k | £1.99k | £3.23k | £3.52k | £4.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.70k | £1.88k | £2.45k | £1.02k | £3.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 February 2025 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/08/2010 AS AMENDED ON 30/11/2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS') ARE: (A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPLEMENTARY AND RELIGIOUS EDUCATION CLASSES. (B) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST PERSONS LIVING IN BANGLADESH AND PERSONS OF BANGLADESH ORIGIN NOW LIVING IN THE UK, PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION. (C) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, OF PERSONS OF BANGLADESH ORIGIN NOW LIVING IN THE UK, THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. (D) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONG THE VICTIMS OF NATURAL DISASTER IN THE UK AND ABROAD SPECIFICALLY FOR THOSE WHO ARE EFFECTED BY FLOOD, CYCLONE, EARTHQUAKE AND TSUNAMI.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 White Tower Way
LONDON
E1 4RN
- Phone:
- 07825517806
- Email:
- mamrokhanitrust@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window