ROYAL COLLEGE OF ART STUDENTS' UNION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Representation of students. Social activities. Recreational facilities - Artbar and RCAfe.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of Westminster
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 20 December 2011: Standard registration
- 18 April 2024: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 18 April 2024: Funds transferred to 1204514 ROYAL COLLEGE OF ART STUDENTS' UNION
- RCASU (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £591.65k | £405.89k | £301.74k | £320.52k | £488.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £568.99k | £362.71k | £246.00k | £331.39k | £513.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £239.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.54k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £350.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £212 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £568.99k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 02 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 02 May 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 MAR 2011
Charitable objects
THE UNION'S OBJECTS ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AT THE ROYAL COLLEGE OF ART FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: PROMOTING THE INTERESTS AND WELFARE OF STUDENTS AT THE ROYAL COLLEGE OF ART DURING THEIR COURSE OF STUDY AND REPRESENTING, SUPPORTING AND ADVISING STUDENTS; BEING THE RECOGNISED REPRESENTATIVE CHANNEL BETWEEN STUDENTS AND THE ROYAL COLLEGE OF ART AND ANY OTHER EXTERNAL BODIES; AND PROVIDING SOCIAL, CULTURAL, SPORTING AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FORUMS FOR DISCUSSIONS AND DEBATE FOR THE PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF ITS STUDENTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window