CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY GRADUATE UNION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Union's objectives are the advancement of education of graduate and postgraduate students at the University of Cambridge by: -Promoting the interests and welfare of students, and representing, supporting and advising students -being the recognised representative channel between Members and the University -providing social and recreational activities for the development of Members
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 28 June 2012: Standard registration
- 19 May 2021: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 19 May 2021: Funds transferred to 288365 CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION
- GU (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £206.76k | £241.09k | £222.30k | £212.55k | £312.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187.69k | £230.87k | £242.22k | £238.02k | £291.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | 31 May 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | 31 May 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 10 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | 10 May 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 JAN 1981 AS AMENDED ON 25/06/2012 AS AMENDED ON 21/05/2014
Charitable objects
THE UNION’S OBJECTS ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF GRADUATE STUDENTS AT THE UNIVERSITY AND ANY OTHER PERSONS WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE UNION BY: 5.1 PROMOTING THE INTERESTS AND WELFARE OF GRADUATE STUDENTS AND OTHER MEMBERS OF THE UNION, AND PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ADVICE TO THEM; 5.2 BEING A RECOGNISED REPRESENTATIVE CHANNEL BETWEEN GRADUATE STUDENTS (OTHER THAN THOSE WHO ARE NOT MEMBERS OF THE UNION) AND THE UNIVERSITY AND BODIES EXTERNAL TO THE UNIVERSITY; AND 5.3 PROVIDING SOCIAL, CULTURAL, SPORTING AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FORUMS FOR DISCUSSIONS AND DEBATE FOR THE PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF GRADUATE STUDENTS AND ANY OTHER PERSONS WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE UNION,
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window