Financial history WORD OF HOPE BIBLE CHURCH

Charity number: 1144750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £123.31k £71.58k £79.50k £220.61k £111.23k
Total expenditure £99.29k £69.15k £79.51k £80.12k £137.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £8.48k £5.88k £2.59k N/A