ALL SAINTS NORMANTON COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Well Project is a community based project operating in Normanton, West Yorkshire. We provide positive activities for the community to engage with, aiming to build a stronger improved community for the future. Include Youth Clubs, Health Walks, Food Bank, Lunch Clubs, Friendship Groups, Coffee Mornings, Community Events and more.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £63,734 from 6 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 23 September 2011: Standard registration
- 29 January 2024: Funds received from 1127715 ESCAYP
- THE WELL PROJECT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Josie Pritchard | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Steven Hudson | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Shaw | Trustee | 10 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christine Walukiewicz | Trustee | 10 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Hashimi | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev ALAN MURRAY | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|||||
JUNE LESLEY TOWNEND | Trustee | 07 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.84k | £143.29k | £85.40k | £59.39k | £84.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.05k | £47.79k | £141.79k | £57.14k | £67.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £31.88k | £52.60k | £33.40k | £25.44k | £63.73k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 March 2024 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 March 2024 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/03/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/09/2011
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NORMANTON AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT WITHIN AN ETHOS OF CHRISTIAN CARE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY: 1) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS 2) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC;
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE NORMANTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Well Project
off Castleford Road
Haw Hill Park
Normanton
West Yorkshire
WF6 2DP
- Phone:
- 07872551640
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window