OXBRIDGE SUMMER CAMPS ABROAD LTD.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OSCA organises not-for-profit English language summer camps that offer UK students the opportunity to volunteer abroad, and help young people from other countries to enhance their English language skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- China
- Hong Kong
- Japan
Governance
- 12 June 2012: Standard registration
- OSCA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUAN SCOULLER | Chair | 12 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Scott Goulding | Trustee | 28 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Delilah Jay Cairns Haylor | Trustee | 28 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Prabhvir Singh Marway | Trustee | 28 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Animit Kulkarni | Trustee | 31 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Wilkinson | Trustee | 09 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.76k | £7.69k | £5.91k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.37k | £7.59k | £5.89k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 310 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 310 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 676 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 676 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 March 2022 | 270 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 13 August 2020 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 OCT 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/04/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY TEACHING ENGLISH LANGUAGE OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
91 Empress Avenue
ILFORD
IG1 3DG
- Phone:
- 07599429877
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window