Accounts and annual returns HORIZON CHURCH SUTTON

Charity number: 1143831
Charity reporting is up to date (46 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 March 2025 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 18 March 2025 46 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 July 2024 170 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 19 July 2024 170 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 March 2022 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 16 March 2022 44 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window