Inspire Fitness Academy

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We tackle inequalities in disadvantaged communities,helping them to become more inclusive.We promote engagement and inclusion through fitness,1:1 work,volunteering, mentoring, education, training and events,increasing confidence, wellbeing, life-skills and employability and encouraging community-cohesion.We adapt to complex individual needs,including mental-health issues and learning difficulties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 09 December 2011: Standard registration
- Inspire Fitness Academy (Working name)
- SPLASH FIT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Knibbs | Chair | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stacie Gallear | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Smith | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carl Andrews | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.41k | £113.05k | £123.45k | £85.40k | £109.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.54k | £72.72k | £100.92k | £85.03k | £108.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 April 2023 | 164 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2021
(These accounts |
13 April 2023 | 164 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2020
(These accounts |
18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/10/2010 AS AMENDED ON 20/09/2011 as amended on 11 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR FITNESS CLASSES, SWIMMING AND AMATEUR BOXING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
96 Pastures Hill
Littleover
DERBY
DE23 4BD
- Phone:
- 07546161805
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window