GLOBAL FELLOWSHIP OF CONFESSING ANGLICANS

Charity number: 1144227
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity's objects are specifically restricted to the advancement of the Orthodox Anglican Christian faith for the benefit of the public in accordance with the tenets of orthodoxy set out in the Jerusalem Declaration declared on 29 June 2008 at the Global Anglican Future Conference and which is set out in the Schedule to the Articles.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Australia
  • Brazil
  • Canada
  • Chile
  • Congo (Democratic Republic)
  • Dubai
  • Ghana
  • Ireland
  • Israel
  • Kenya
  • Mozambique
  • New Zealand
  • Nigeria
  • Pakistan
  • Rwanda
  • South Africa
  • South Sudan
  • Tanzania
  • Uganda
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 October 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID DUNCAN COODE MONRO Chair 24 September 2014
THE ZIMBIALA TRUST
Received: On time
THE JEFFERISS RESEARCH TRUST
Received: On time
THE ALLIGATOR TRUST
Received: 12 days late
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL CORNHILL
Received: On time
THE BREWCROFT TRUST
Received: On time
Carolyn Swan Parlato Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Joel Herbert Reinhardt Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Rt. Rev John Allen Marquis Guernsey Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Rt Revd Paul Eric Donison Trustee 30 November 2023
None on record
Most Rev Laurent Mbanda Trustee 17 September 2020
None on record
Rev Charles Christopher Marnham Trustee 17 September 2020
None on record
Emmanuel Andrew Kampouris Trustee 17 September 2020
None on record
Dr Laurence Alan Scandrett Trustee 13 December 2018
None on record
Rev Christopher Green Trustee 14 September 2017
None on record
Olayinka Fisher Trustee 31 March 2015
None on record
SARAH ROSEMARY ANN FINCH Trustee 16 September 2011
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST HELEN, BISHOPSGATE
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
WYCLIFFE HALL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £709.07k £497.71k £389.06k £270.79k £2.20m
Total expenditure £936.10k £595.40k £362.91k £230.85k £1.49m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £685.79k N/A N/A N/A £549.33k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £23.23k N/A N/A N/A £1.65m
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A £57.93k
Income - Investment £0 N/A N/A N/A £597
Income - Other £50 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £839.89k N/A N/A N/A £1.44m
Expenditure - Raising funds £96.21k N/A N/A N/A £45.74k
Expenditure - Governance £12.77k N/A N/A N/A £6.18k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.52k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Own use assets £3.07k N/A N/A N/A £0
Long-term investments £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Other assets £405.14k N/A N/A N/A £1.07m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities £48.40k N/A N/A N/A £34.57k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 10 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 10 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 14 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 14 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 22 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 22 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 22 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 22 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 30 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 30 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Christ Church Central
The DQ Centre
Fitzwilliam Street
Sheffield
South Yorks
S1 4JR
Phone:
02038838661