Financial history SHARNFORD YOUTH CLUB

Charity Number: 502213
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.33k £5.42k £7.96k £12.57k £26.74k
Total expenditure £2.42k £9.86k £10.96k £3.16k £2.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £359 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A