GOBAITH MON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This charity raises funds to employ personnel to work, mainly in secondary schools, carrying out the aims of its charter, namely to express its Christian convictions in support and service to the youth of Anglesey.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Isle Of Anglesey
Governance
- 19 January 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andre Paui Rudolph | Chair | 20 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Shema Merce Westwell | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eirwyn Vaughan | Trustee | 24 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
DYLAN WYN REES | Trustee | 20 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev Peter Gordon-Roberts | Trustee | 20 September 2013 |
|
|||||
SUZANNE MARIE RUDOLPH | Trustee | 03 October 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.52k | £36.27k | £33.95k | £21.86k | £18.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.35k | £39.23k | £33.44k | £20.18k | £10.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.89k | £3.37k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 DEC 2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE IN ANGLESEY BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Brynteg Estate
Llandegfan
Menai Bridge
LL59 5TY
- Phone:
- 01248713003
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window