GARDINER HILL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Allocating tenancies for properties acquired by NAViGO Health and Social Care CIC to provide suitable accommodation for vulnerable people. Grants to enable vulnerable people access to Education, Employment and Housing opportunities. Holding charitable funds on behalf of vulnerable people and services in North East Lincolnshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Lincolnshire
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 16 March 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eileen Walsh | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Keen | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Richard Darby | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Lewington | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Coulbeck | Trustee | 02 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Richards | Trustee | 18 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gillian Hobson | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Kinch | Trustee | 14 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE DAWN ELLIS | Trustee | 19 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.89k | £102.58k | £237.84k | £56.38k | £63.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.92k | £35.92k | £34.30k | £49.57k | £68.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.94k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 OCT 2011 as amended on 18 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEATLH; THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
NAViGO House
3 - 7 Brighowgate
GRIMSBY
SOUTH HUMBERSIDE
DN32 0QE
- Phone:
- 01472583053
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window