Financial history BARLESTONE COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity Number: 502219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.20k £1.94k £8.80k £13.61k £15.92k
Total expenditure £7.67k £227 £1.49k £11.18k £15.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A