THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF PORTISHEAD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. Provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work. Teaching of Christianity. Taking religious assemblies in schools. Provision of a youth club with a Christian ethos. Promoting Christianity through meetings and literature. Provision of Christian activities for young families. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

20 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Somerset
Governance
- 20 December 2011: Previously excepted registration
- 19 March 2021: Funds received from 310122 EMMA HONNYWILL
- PORTISHEAD CHURCH OF ENGLAND (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SYLVIA KNIGHTBRIDGE | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|||||||
Graham Fiddler | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Mary Duncan | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Stevens | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Lindsay Rachel Smith | Trustee | 02 October 2022 |
|
|||||||
Rev Tonya Nixon | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Kathryn Benjamin | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Diane Jennifer Yeoman | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Jennifer Mary McDuff | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Bethanie Hobbs | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Olwyn Kiero Watson | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Amy Broyd | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rosey Dimond | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Olufunmiso Adetokunbo Ojo | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Linda Mary Taylor | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Mark Joseph Fuller | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Kathryn Elizabeth Phillips | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Gill Ogden | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Rob Eastwood Dewing | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|||||||
Paul Leonard Jeffery | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £479.07k | £274.58k | £296.25k | £328.97k | £283.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £411.92k | £313.44k | £300.86k | £312.14k | £281.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1956
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Barnabas Centre
West Hill
Portishead
BRISTOL
BS20 6LN
- Phone:
- 01275846230
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window