PRESTON GUILD LINK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In 2012-13 the Guild Link Charity participated in many of the Preston Guild 2012 events. The charity was involved in supporting the creation of a Guild Time Capsule in 2012, in partnership with the University of Central Lancashire. The charity supported the work to develop the Harris Flights programme of arts and cultural events. It continues to support a variety of Guild Legacy events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lancashire
Governance
- 19 March 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR RODERICK DUBROW-MARSHALL | Chair | 31 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Peter Kelly | Trustee | 25 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3 | £3 | £3 | £3 | £3 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 18 July 2024 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 June 2023 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 15 August 2021 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 29 July 2020 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/02/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION BY ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) MUSIC, OPERA, DANCE, SINGING, LITERATURE AND THE USUAL ARTS (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) THE COMMISSIONING, HOLDING OF FESTIVALS, EVENTS, ACTIVITIES FOR CULTURE, IDEAS AND CREATIVITY IN ASSOCIATION WITH THE 2012 AND SUBSEQUENT PRESTON GUILDS, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF PRESTON. THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT AND ASSISTANCE FOR PLAYING SPORTS AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES IN ASSOCIATION WITH THE 2012 AND SUBSEQUENT PRESTON GUILDS, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF PRESTON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 Darwin Avenue
BUXTON
SK17 6NF
- Phone:
- 07792766613
- Email:
- guild2012@preston.gov.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window