Financial history FRIENDS OF BROOMFIELD SOUTH SILC

Charity number: 1143948
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.66k £9.91k £13.71k £24.83k £58.38k
Total expenditure £5.04k £5.47k £7.42k £13.22k £45.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A