THINK TWICE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of Education and Health, Relief of Poverty, Development Through Sport. Think Twice operates in the UK and Central America.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Kent
- Throughout London
- Guatemala
Governance
- 10 November 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Krishan Attawar | Chair | 12 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Oscar Alfonso Garcia | Trustee | 07 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROSS BURLAND | Trustee | 07 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.82k | £5.48k | £5.04k | £1.05k | £1.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.82k | £23.98k | £5.09k | £1.16k | £1.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 837 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 837 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1202 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1202 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 SEP 2011
Charitable objects
OBJECTS 4 THE CHARITYÔÇÖS OBJECTS (ÔÇ£OBJECTSÔÇØ) ARE THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH OF VULNERABLE CHILDREN. THIS IS TO BE ACHIEVED (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO ORPHANAGES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS THAT ARE PROVIDING EDUCATION AND SUPPORT OF CHILDREN IN VULNERABLE CIRCUMSTANCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Belmont Close
Maidstone
ME16 9DY
- Phone:
- 01622728070
- Email:
- krishancattawar@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window