Accounts and annual returns BORN TO BE BEAUTIFUL

Charity number: 1144946
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 October 2020 18 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2019 13 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2018 30 July 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2017 27 July 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2017 Not Required