Financial history RU4 MUSIC

Charity number: 1144904
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £6.61k £7.90k £6.88k £7.17k £7.00k
Total expenditure £6.25k £8.20k £7.20k £6.78k £6.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A