CURE AND ACTION FOR TAY-SACHS (CATS) FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The CATS Foundation operates in the UK and provides support to families affected by Tay-Sachs and Sandhoff disease. We provide equipment that a child with the disease may need, respite holidays, funeral funding, a support network and information to families. The charity also supports the research into a possible cure for these devestating diseases.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 November 2011: Standard registration
- 11 July 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 11 July 2023: Funds transferred to 1200737 CURE AND ACTION FOR TAY-SACHS (CATS) FOUNDATION
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.77k | £60.46k | £44.93k | £68.12k | £90.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.28k | £51.37k | £40.49k | £53.83k | £87.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £30.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 OCT 2011
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS (“THE OBJECTS”): THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG SUFFERERS OF TAY-SACHS BY: A) SUPPORTING RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INTO THE CAUSES, PREVENTION, DIAGNOSIS AND METHODS OF TREATMENT OF TAY-SACHS AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH; B) PROVISION OF A SUPPORT NETWORK FOR FAMILIES SUFFERING FROM THE EFFECTS OF TAY-SACHS INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, PROVISION OF RESPITE HOLIDAYS FOR SUFFERERS AND THEIR CARERS; C) THE PURCHASE OF EQUIPMENT NOT AVAILABLE ON THE NHS TO ALLEVIATE SUFFERING AND IMPROVE CONDITIONS OF LIFE; D) FINANCING TRIPS AT HOME OR OVERSEAS FOR TREATMENT IF AND WHEN AN EFFECTIVE AND LICENSED TREATMENT IS FOUND.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window