CENTRAL CHURCH TORQUAY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a) Celebration of public worship. b) The teaching of the Christian faith. c) Mission and Evangelism. d) Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and bereaved. e) The provision of facilities with a Christian ethos for the local community, including (but not restricted to) the elderly, the young and other groups with special needs. f) The support of other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Torbay
Governance
- 05 December 2011: Standard registration
- 23 July 2018: Funds received from 1120885 TORQUAY CHILD CONTACT CENTRE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jeff Short | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Hornby | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Widberg | Trustee | 04 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Wescott | Trustee | 11 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Price | Trustee | 11 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Mills | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Peter Williamson | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jan Newman | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|||||
Sue Norman | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Price | Trustee | 27 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
John Tibbetts | Trustee | 16 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ann Coatham | Trustee | 16 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
TESSA GOODWIN | Trustee | 05 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET NEWMAN | Trustee | 07 November 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.19k | £67.44k | £77.83k | £97.32k | £100.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.39k | £46.63k | £62.86k | £120.35k | £105.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/12/2010 AS AMENDED ON 25/11/2012 AS AMENDED ON 17/10/2013
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE PARTICIPATING CHURCHES
Area of benefit
THE UNITARY AUTHORITY OF TORBAY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tor Hill Road
TORQUAY
Devon
TQ2 5RN
- Phone:
- 01803 522109
- Email:
- jannewman@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window