SOUTH WALES BOBBY VAN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Blaenau Gwent
- Caerphilly
- Monmouthshire
- Newport City
- Torfaen
Governance
- 10 October 2011: Standard registration
- 03 April 2012: Funds received from 1097496 THE GWENT BOBBY VAN TRUST
- 12 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/09/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN THE SOUTH WALES AREA, THE PROTECTION OF PEOPLE AND PROPERTY AND THE PREVENTION OF CRIMINAL ACTS IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF HOME SECURITY MEASURES FOR THE ELDERLY, VULNERABLE AND OTHER VICTIMS OF CRIME INCLUDING BURGLARY AND DOMESTIC ABUSE AND THE DISSEMINATION OF CRIME PROTECTION INFORMATION.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window