BRIGHTON-LUSAKA HEALTH LINK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides educational and clinical support for Health care Workers at University Teaching Hospital Lusaka and the Medical and Nursing Schools. Arranges short-term visits to deliver courses or clinical services. Host visits for health care workers from UTH to the Brighton Hospitals and Universities for a defined period to enable them to develop their professional training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
- Zambia
Governance
- 29 September 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Sophie Morris | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|||||
LORRAINE TINKER | Trustee | 04 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr PAUL SEDDON | Trustee | 04 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR MELANIE JANE NEWPORT | Trustee | 29 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Nixon | Trustee | 21 September 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.45k | £16.50k | £3.37k | £2.09k | £1.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.41k | £21.03k | £4.34k | £1.38k | £216 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 20 April 2024 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 02 April 2023 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 04 April 2022 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 21 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/04/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG THE PEOPLE OF ZAMBIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Department of Anaesthetics
Royal Sussex County Hospital
Eastern Road
Brighton
BN2 5BE
- Phone:
- 01273696955
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window