LOVE TEMPLE CHRISTIAN CHURCH (LTCC)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust core principal activity is Christ Centred Church undertakings and secondly activities are services to humanity and general local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 15 March 2012: Standard registration
- LTCC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MARK KOBINA ABBAN | Chair | 21 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Isaac Appiah | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Opoku Ansah | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Silas Agyemang | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Akua Dannoa Agyemang | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL OPOKU | Trustee | 21 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
CYNTHIA ADDO | Trustee | 21 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.02k | £118.40k | £86.69k | £78.75k | £56.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.24k | £112.13k | £86.15k | £88.82k | £69.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £11.01k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 8 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 8 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 373 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 373 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 17 July 2023 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 17 July 2023 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 22 November 2022 | 206 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 22 November 2022 | 206 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 July 2022 | 456 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 July 2022 | 456 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/07/2011
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES AND TEACHINGS OF THE BIBLE. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat A
13 Moreton Road
SOUTH CROYDON
CR2 7DN
- Phone:
- 02088855200
- Email:
- revmabban@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
lovetemplechurch.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window