KINGSWAY RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2019
Total income includes £1,500 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 14 February 2012: Standard registration
- 10 September 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
- 10 September 2021: Funds transferred to 1192345 KINGSWAY RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION
- KRA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.89k | £36.95k | £48.81k | £50.27k | £62.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.30k | £47.75k | £36.63k | £36.92k | £49.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.58k | £100 | £7.00k | £500 | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 31 July 2019 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | 31 July 2019 | 1 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 05 July 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | 05 July 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 AUG 2011 AS AMENDED ON 07/02/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: COMMUNITY CENTRE TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF WEST TEIGNMOUTH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window