THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SS PHILIP AND JAMES, WHITTON

Charity number: 1144696
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Regular public worship open to all | The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation | Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved | Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups | Taking of religious assemblies in schools | Promoting the whole mission of the Church through provision of activities for all.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £137,850
Total expenditure: £144,715

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Richmond Upon Thames

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 November 2011: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • SS PHILIP & JAMES' PCC, WHITTON (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Madeleine Joyce Swann Trustee 06 April 2025
None on record
Peter Norman Lee Trustee 06 April 2025
None on record
Susan Lesley Hodder-Hesling Trustee 06 April 2025
None on record
Rev Kate O'Sullivan Trustee 03 February 2025
None on record
Gavin John Cowling Trustee 22 October 2023
None on record
Angela Bowman Trustee 26 March 2023
THE WHITTON CHARITIES
Received: On time
Lucy-Jane James Trustee 26 March 2023
None on record
Ian Clabon Trustee 03 April 2022
None on record
Mark Johnson Trustee 03 April 2022
None on record
Rosemary Francis Hodi Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
Christopher James Penson Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
Colin Downey Trustee 18 March 2018
None on record
Janette Linda Furze Trustee 14 April 2016
THE WHITTON CHARITIES
Received: On time
CHRISTOPHER DAVID RAYMOND Trustee 11 October 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £137.22k £207.00k £106.20k £157.44k £137.85k
Total expenditure £137.31k £97.80k £88.59k £147.94k £144.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 15 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 20 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 17 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
205 Kneller Road
Twickenham
TW2 7DY
Phone:
02088982694