HYLTON CASTLE AND TOWN END FARM BOY'S CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ALL SPORTING ACTIVITIES AND YOUTH WORK FOR BOYS AND GIRLS THE AIM OF THE CLUB IS TO HELP AND EDUCATE BOTH BOYS AND GIRLS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE ACTIVITIES ,SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL,MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY GROW TOFULL MATURITYAS INDIVIDUALSAND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sunderland
Governance
- 01 March 1983: Standard registration
- 21 April 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.71k | £12.67k | £13.90k | £8.38k | £12.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.02k | £13.36k | £14.43k | £7.66k | £12.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £3.88k | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £3.88k | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 31 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 22 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 DECEMBER 1969
Charitable objects
THE AIM OF THE CLUB IS TO HELP AND EDUCATE BOYS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE ACTIVITIES SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window