Financial history DIGITAL UNITE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1145124
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2013 31/10/2014 31/10/2015 31/10/2016 31/10/2017
Total gross income £61.53k £82.93k £0 £1 £0
Total expenditure £61.51k £82.11k £1.92k £1.03k £686
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0