WREXHAM HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The League was established to raise funds for, and provide physical anenities for the benefit of patients at Wrexham Maelor Hospital, and to support the charitable work of the Hospital.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
74 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Conwy
- Denbighshire
- Flintshire
- Gwynedd
- Wrexham
Governance
- 08 March 1973: Standard registration
- WREXHAM HOSPITALS' LEAGUE OF FRIENDS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS BRENDA MARGARET BRYDEN | Chair | 22 June 1981 |
|
|
||||
Tudor Williams | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
MRS DIANA EVANS | Trustee | 04 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET WINIFRED ELLIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TREVOR MICHAEL JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MENNA STORY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £573.92k | £430.77k | £97.41k | £195.53k | £433.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £634.25k | £514.53k | £109.46k | £153.95k | £433.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.11k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £31.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £479.11k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £57.83k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £5.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £264.29k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £369.96k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.82k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £260.48k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £29.19k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 September 2024 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 11 September 2024 | 73 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 DECEMBER 1968 AS AMENDED 16 MARCH 1992 AND 15 MAY 1995 as amended on 21 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
TO RAISE FUNDS FOR AND PROVIDE PHYSICAL AMENITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PATIENTS OF THE WREXHAM HOSPITAL, AND GENERALLY, TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE WREXHAM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 CHANTICLEER CLOSE
WREXHAM
LL13 9EQ
- Phone:
- 01978356765
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window