ISERVE AFRICA UK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian faith in accordance with the Statement of Belief (see Sch. 2 of Articles of Association) with particular focus on training and equipping people for bible-teaching and pastoral ministry and to relieve poverty, advance health and education as an expression of Christian faith. In the period the Trust has supported iServe Africa in Kenya, training bible preachers and leaders.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Merton
- Kenya
Governance
- 09 December 2011: Standard registration
- 26 January 2017: Funds received from 288416 KENYA CHURCH ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Gregory Harker | Chair | 17 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Forward | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jecolia Zihua Horn | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Lewis Vernon | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Hilary Frances Nicholls | Trustee | 28 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Guy Craufurd Hayward | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.08k | £103.18k | £105.68k | £92.94k | £131.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.83k | £102.84k | £105.53k | £94.54k | £122.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 JUN 2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEF AS SET OUT IN SCHEDULE 2 ATTACHED TO THE ARTICLES, WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) ON TRAINING AND EQUIPPING PEOPLE FOR BIBLE TEACHING AND PASTORAL MINISTRY: AND (2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, ADVANCE HEALTH AND ADVANCE EDUCATION AS AN EXPRESSION OF CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dundonald Church
577 Kingston Road
Raynes Park
London
SW20 8SA
- Phone:
- 02085434411
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window