Financial history INSPIRE PLUS

Charity Number: 1144507
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £666.47k £798.68k £1.18m £1.08m £1.30m
Total expenditure £548.10k £560.25k £811.68k £997.96k £1.04m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £256.14k £261.45k N/A
Income from government grants £32.49k £12.31k £9.74k N/A £308.76k
Income - Donations and legacies £12.00k £28.03k £7.31k £271.51k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £620.81k £757.00k £1.17m £791.24k £1.22m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.16k £1.36k £653 £17.70k £78.84k
Income - Other £32.49k £12.31k £6.73k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £548.10k £560.25k £811.68k £997.96k £1.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £17.21k £32.78k £38.35k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0