WEAVERS COMMUNITY FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WEAVERS COMMUNITY FORUM IS A GRASSROOTS YOUTH AND COMMUNITY ORGANISATION CONDUCTING ACTIVITIES IN THE EAST OF LONDON. IT OFFERS A WIDE RANGE OF SERVICES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AND THE COMMUNITY AT LARGE. THESE CAN BE GROUPED INTO THE FOLLOWING THEMES: EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT: HEALTH AND WELL-BEING: SPORTS AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES: COMMUNITY EVENTS: AND GENERIC YOUTH CLUB ACTIVITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £7,074 from 3 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barking And Dagenham
- Hackney
- Newham
- Redbridge
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 02 May 2012: Standard registration
- WCF (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR MD MUZAMMEL HUSSEN, | Chair | 26 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Xuseen Abdi Weli | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
MAINUL ISLAM HAIDER | Trustee | 15 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
AZAFAR MIAH | Trustee | 26 October 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.52k | £129.20k | £57.37k | £45.90k | £18.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.52k | £58.52k | £49.71k | £43.20k | £44.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.78k | £12.77k | £21.68k | £14.99k | £7.07k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/07/2010 AS AMENDED ON 28/04/2012 AS AMENDED ON 06/01/2013 as amended on 21 Jan 2021 as amended on 13 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
ARE TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS AND SURROUNDING LONDON BOROUGH'S
Contact information
- Address:
-
Weavers Community Centre
10 Shacklewell Street
Bethnal Green
London
E2 7EG
- Phone:
- 02077398568
- Email:
- info@weaversforum.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window