HOME-START HAMPSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Home-Start Hampshire's Key Activities are: A. to safeguard, protect and preserve the good health, both mental and physical of children and parents of children; B. to prevent cruelty to or maltreatment of children; C. to relieve sickness, poverty and need amongst children and parents of children; D. to promote the education of the public in better standards of child care;
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £53,652 from 17 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
132 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hampshire
Governance
- 15 November 2011: Standard registration
- 28 November 2011: Funds received from 1091202 HOME-START HAMPSHIRE GROUP
- 13 February 2019: Funds received from 1153129 HOME-START RUSHMOOR & HART
- 24 April 2019: Funds received from 1108953 HOME-START MEON VALLEY
- 24 April 2019: Funds received from 1107037 HOME-START HAVANT
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Jane Katherine Payler | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Cracknell | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Eileen Ball | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Wollam | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|||||
LYNN LUDFORD | Trustee | 15 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
CLARE KENNEDY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £493.20k | £662.61k | £666.24k | £510.07k | £287.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £556.13k | £574.24k | £573.86k | £712.37k | £438.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £50.50k | £80.84k | £121.47k | £66.57k | £53.65k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £46.41k | £52.17k | £29.95k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £588.34k | £595.14k | £436.11k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | £0 | £2.31k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £27.86k | £18.93k | £41.71k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £574.24k | £573.86k | £656.55k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | £55.82k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £96.88k | £87.16k | £151.68k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 JUN 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22 MAY 2018
Charitable objects
A. TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; B. TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN; C. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; D. TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE. E. TO PROMOTE AND DEVELOP THE PROFILE, EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF HOME-START CHARITIES IN HAMPSHIRE F. TO PREPARE AND PRESENT FUNDING BIDS WHERE COLLECTIVE APPLICATIONS ARE APPROPRIATE G. TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION ABOUT THE WORK OF HOME-START CHARITIES; PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN THE AREA OF HAMPSHIRE AND ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wickham Community Centre
Mill Lane
Wickham
FAREHAM
Hampshire
PO17 5AL
- Phone:
- 0330 1242 095
- Email:
- clare.kennedy@hshants.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window