LEGASEE EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Legasee works with veterans to advance the education of the public in the effects of military activities and to promote the conservation of records of veterans who have been involved in military conflict. We achieve this by capturing these experiences and observations on digital film for future generations and developing projects that educate and inform the students and general public of today.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 January 2012: Standard registration
- LEGASEE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Bewley | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ronald CD Hicks | Trustee | 17 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Albert John Berritt | Trustee | 25 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
JAMES KENNETH BUTLER | Trustee | 10 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN DOUGLAS ERNEST BISIKER | Trustee | 10 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
DARREN RICHARDS BA HONS | Trustee | 10 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.47k | £41.95k | £1.91k | £2.64k | £59.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.88k | £40.94k | £18.07k | £8.48k | £15.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2023 | 324 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/09/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT AND EFFECT OF MILITARY ACTIVITY AND TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION OF RECORDS OF VETERANS' PERSONAL EXPERIENCES AND COMMENT FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 MORNINGTON ROAD
LONDON
E4 7DT
- Phone:
- 02070339773
- Email:
- MARTIN@LEGASEE.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window