THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE ANNUNCIATION BRYANSTON STREET, ST MARYLEBONE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Annunciation Marble Arch is a Church of England parish church in Central London. It has an active congregation, regular acts of worship and a church school. The church building is listed Grade 2* and is open most days for people to visit and use for private prayer. The church hosts regular community events, such as concerts and exhibitions, as well as events for the deaf community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 28 March 2012: Previously excepted registration
- THE ANNUNCIATION MARBLE ARCH PCC (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Revd Dr Lincoln Harvey | Chair | 04 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Therese Bak | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nipha Tinto | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lee Wu | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stelios Solomou | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Slingsby | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Olufunke Ajenifuja | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
David De Kervern | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Mohammed | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Maria Kastani | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
GAVIN MONK | Trustee | 29 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
SIMON THOMAS THWAITES | Trustee | 22 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
STEVE PHILLIPS | Trustee | 22 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
VLADKA ORIANA THWAITES | Trustee | 22 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £252.87k | £173.02k | £200.28k | £176.21k | £260.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £159.84k | £200.91k | £85.26k | £174.95k | £202.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £28.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH OF THE ANNUNCIATION
BRYANSTON STREET
LONDON
W1H 7AH
- Phone:
- 020 7723 6434
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window