NGENE ST LUKE'S INTERNATIONAL EYE HOSPITAL & CHAPEL AMAWBIA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1 To establish and run an eye hospital that will care for all peoples. 2 To teach and preach Christian principles to all willing to listen to us in a purely voluntary basis. 3 To maintain the hospital services to a high international standard. 4 This work is done in a village eye hospital built in Amawbia Town in Anambra State Nigeria of which full web address is WWW.NSLIEHAMAWBIA.COM
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 08 January 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Nigeria
Governance
- 06 January 2012: Standard registration
- 31 October 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE NGENE ST LUKEÔÇÖS INTERNATIONAL EYE HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- THE NGENE ST LUKEÔÇÖS INTERNATIONAL EYE HOSPITAL AMAWBIA (Previous name)
- THE NGENE ST LUKE'S INTERNATIONAL EYE HOSPITAL (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 07/01/2013 | 08/01/2014 | 08/01/2015 | 08/01/2016 | 08/01/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | £8.00k | £5.00k | £3.20k | £2.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.95k | £7.99k | £4.96k | £2.00k | £950 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 08 January 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 08 January 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 08 January 2017 | 27 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 January 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 January 2016 | 17 January 2017 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 January 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 January 2015 | 25 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 January 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 JAN 2011
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ANAMBRA STATE NIGERIA: A) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH BY PROVIDING EYE CARE FACILITIES AND ESTABLISHING AND RUNNING A HOSPITAL WHICH IS ABLE PRIMARILY TO DIAGNOSE AND TREAT AND MANAGE ALL DISEASES OF THE EYE AND B) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY PRAYING AND PREACHING IN THE HOSPITAL CHAPEL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window