Financial history MANHOOD WILDLIFE AND HERITAGE

Charity number: 1147335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £175.68k £137.42k £67.61k £38.13k £51.40k
Total expenditure £162.46k £118.03k £44.12k £44.47k £48.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £15.12k £3.84k £430 £950 £5.60k