INTERNATIONAL FRIENDS OF THE INTERNATIONAL LYRIC ART FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objective is the promotion to the public generally of the arts and particularly music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
- France
Governance
- 31 May 2012: Standard registration
- IFILAF (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LAURENCE CHARLES NEIL BLACKALL MA | Chair | 14 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Aymeric Lavin | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Laffargue | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Beatrice Schlumberger | Trustee | 24 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANE CARTER | Trustee | 14 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAWOOD SYED LLB, LLM | Trustee | 14 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £735.60k | £513.10k | £610.79k | £733.72k | £364.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £712.06k | £502.99k | £603.17k | £102.22k | £1.02m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £735.60k | £513.10k | £610.79k | £733.72k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £712.06k | £502.99k | £603.17k | £102.22k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.16k | £2.16k | £2.16k | £2.16k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £709.75k | £500.73k | £600.89k | £100.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 19 February 2025 | 204 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 19 February 2025 | 204 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 11 September 2024 | 409 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 11 September 2024 | 409 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 11 September 2024 | 774 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 11 September 2024 | 774 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 01 February 2022 | 186 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 01 February 2022 | 186 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 06 October 2020 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 06 October 2020 | 68 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 APR 2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART OF MUSIC
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wellers Accountants
1 Vincent Square
LONDON
SW1P 2PN
- Phone:
- +33144885967
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window