THE REPTILE RESCUE CENTRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Charity are, for the public benefit, to rescue, board and place in good homes stray or unwanted reptiles and to continue to care for and protect reptiles in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Havering
Governance
- 11 April 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES KENNETH HILBROWN | Chair | 29 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Jake James Hillbrown | Trustee | 12 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Margaret Hillbrown | Trustee | 31 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.84k | £7.00k | £7.97k | £8.59k | £8.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.76k | £7.54k | £7.70k | £8.45k | £8.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 13 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 10 June 2022 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Memorandum
Charitable objects
TO RESCUE, BOARD AND PLACE IN GOOD HOMES STRAY AND UNWANTED REPRILES AND TO CONTINUE TO CARE FOR AND PROTECT REPTILES IN NEED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rose Cottage Farm
Birchwood Lane
Knockholt
SEVENOAKS
Kent
TN14 7LP
- Phone:
- 01708341274
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window